Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Righi, Roxanna Verina (CPSO#: 65501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Larch Street
Suite 400
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 670-9048
Fax: (705) 670-9208
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roxanna Righi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Righi ( CPSO# 65501 )

Business Address:
400 - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 670-9048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROXANNA VERINA RIGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIGHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993