Rikhye, Rakesh Kumar (CPSO#: 31816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 120
135 Queen's Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone: (416) 342-5140
Fax: (416) 342-5148
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rikhye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rikhye ( CPSO# 31816 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 342-5140

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH KUMAR RIKHYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIKHYE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1979 to 14 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009