Riley, Alura Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1852 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V7Z8
Phone: 613 526 5200
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALURA ELIZABETH RILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017