Riley, George Terence (CPSO#: 20802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Apr 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Corporation
Oakville Campus
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1967
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2006 Active View Details [+]
            The  following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration  held  by  Dr. George Terence Riley, by order of the Discipline
            Committee on July 19, 2006:

                  (a)   Effective September 22, 2006, Dr. Riley shall restrict his practice
                        to surgical assisting,  in accordance with an undertaking signed by
                        Dr. Riley;
                  
                  (b)   By September 30, 2006, Dr.  Riley  will provide confirmation to the
                        College, through his practice monitor,  that  as  of that date, Dr.
                        Riley  is  in compliance with the Order of theDiscipline  Committee
                        dated September  29,  2003, and is current and up-to-date on all of
                        his records, referrals, laboratory results and other correspondence
                        in his office and hospital practice.
                  
            The following terms, conditions and  limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration held by Dr. George Terence  Riley,  by  order of the Discipline
            Committee on September 29, 2003:

                  i)    Dr. Riley will have a practice monitor for as  long  as  he holds a
                        license to practice medicine. The practice monitor must be  another
                        member  of the College, approved of by the Registrar of the College
                        or his designate,  and  must  meet  with Dr. Riley a minimum of bi-
                        weekly to review all incoming relevant  medical correspondence with
                        Dr. Riley and ensure timely follow-up on  all  such  correspondence
                        including    request   for   records,   laboratory   results,   and
                        correspondence  from  the College. The monitor must also review Dr.
                        Riley's workload and give  his  consent in writing, a copy of which
                        is to be immediately forwarded to  the  College, prior to Dr. Riley
                        taking on any new patients. The practice monitor and Dr. Riley must
                        together provide a quarterly report to the Registrar of the College
                        or  his designate as to the currency of Dr.  Riley's  records,  the
                        timeliness of his referrals and his follow-up on laboratory results
                        and other correspondence.
                  
                  ii)   Dr. Riley will complete the College's records keeping course at his
                        own expense,  by the end of 2003, including all optional components
                        of the course such as the follow-up review of his records and shall
                        provide proof of  having done so to the Registrar of the College or
                        his designate on or before December 31, 2003.
                  
                  iii)  Dr. Riley will have  his  patient's  file with him for each patient
                        evaluation  or  examination  the  he  conducts  and  he  will  take
                        contemporary  notes  of each such evaluation  or  examination.  Dr.
                        Riley will make specific  note  of any patient request for referral
                        in his records and will note any discussions regarding medical test
                        results discussed.
                  
                  iv)   Dr.  Riley will initial and date all  laboratory,  ultra-sound  and
                        other reports upon reviewing them.
                  
                  v)    Dr. Riley  will  continue  psychotherapy with Dr. O'Sullivan or, in
                        the  event  Dr.  O'Sullivan  ceases   to   practice,  with  another
                        psychiatrist  acceptable to the Registrar of  the  College  or  his
                        designate. Dr.  O'Sullivan,  or  the approved psychiatrist treating
                        Dr. Riley, will provide written confirmation of regular, bi-weekly,
                        attendance to the Registrar of the  College  or his designate every
                        six  months.  In  the  event  that Dr. O'Sullivan or  the  approved
                        psychiatrist   treating  Dr.  Riley   determines   that   bi-weekly
                        attendance is unnecessary,  the  attendance schedule can be altered
                        on notice and with the approval of  the Registrar of the College or
                        his designate. 
                  
                  vi)   Dr. Riley will undergo an age related  peer  assessment  within six
                        (6)  months of the date of this order and again twelve (12)  months
                        thereafter at the expense of the College.
                  
                  vii)  Dr. Riley  will  keep  a  sign  posted  at  all  times, in the form
                        attached hereto as Schedule 1, in all examination rooms used by him
                        for the purpose of seeing patients.
                  
                  viii) Dr. Riley will complete a perinatal bereavement course  offered  by
                        Perinatal  Bereavement  Services  of  Ontario  ("PBSO")  either  on
                        November  12  and  13,  2003  or at the next offering of the course
                        thereafter. If he is unable to  attend  the November, 2003 session,
                        Dr.  Riley will contact the PBSO prior to  November  12,  2003  and
                        inquire  when  the  next course will be held and confirm that he is
                        registered. If the next  course  has  not yet been scheduled at the
                        time of Dr. Riley's inquiry, Dr. Riley  will  continue with monthly
                        follow-ups with the PBSO and provide written notice of such follow-
                        ups  to  the Registrar of the College or his designate  until  such
                        time as he  has registered for the perinatal bereavement course and
                        will provide  evidence  of  having  completed  the  course  to  the
                        Registrar  of  the  College  or  his  designate within two weeks of
                        having completed the course.
                  
                  ix)   Dr. Riley will forthwith execute an irrevocable consent to be filed
                        with the Registrar of the College that  if  allegations of a breach
                        of any of these terms, conditions or limitations  is brought to the
                        attention  of the Registrar, then the Registrar shall  suspend  Dr.
                        Riley's Certificate  of  Registration  on  seven (7) days notice to
                        him,  with  such  suspension  to  remain  in  effect   until   such
                        allegations  have  been  finally  determined  or disposed of by the
                        College through the complaints process and or discipline process
                  
                  x)    Dr. Riley shall pay three thousand seven hundred  and fifty dollars
                        ($3,750.00) for these proceedings within twelve (12) months time.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2006
Summary:

On July 19, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. George Terence Riley to have committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
      1.    Dr. Riley to appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
            recorded on the register. 
 
      2.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, 
            conditions and limitation on Dr. Riley s certificate of registration: 
             
            (a)   Effective September 22, 2006, Dr. Riley shall restrict his practice to 
                  surgical assisting, in accordance with an undertaking executed by him 
                  dated July 19, 2006, 
 
            (b)   By September 30, 2006, Dr. Riley will provide confirmation to the 
                  College, through his practice monitor, that as of that date, Dr. Riley is in 
                  compliance with the Order of the Discipline Committee dated September 
                  29, 2003, and is current and up-to-date on all of his records, referrals, 
                  laboratory results and other correspondence in his office and hospital 
                  practice. 
 
      3.    The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Riley to pay costs to the College in the 
            amount of $1,500.00 by August 30, 2006. 
 
      4.    The Discipline Committee orders the results of this proceeding to be included in 
            the register. 
 
On July 19, 2006, Dr. George Terence Riley entered into the following undertaking with the 
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, and agreed that it will be posted on the public 
register:   
 
1.    I agree that commencing September 22, 2006, I am restricted from performing all medical 
      practice except as a surgical assistant with a physician who is a member of the College of 
      Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who is present at all times at a hospital where that 
      physician has privileges. 
 
2.    I agree that at no time will I conduct any independent patient care. 
 
3.    I agree that as a condition of my certificate of registration, and in order that compliance 
      with conditions 1 and 2 can be monitored, I am required to obtain a letter signed by the 
      Chief of Surgery at every hospital at which I have worked in the previous six months 
      confirming that I have been working only as a surgical assistant.  This letter must be 
      provided to the College on January 1 and June 30 of every year until I cease to practice. 
 
4.    I agree that as a further means of ensuring compliance with conditions 1 and 2, I will 
      execute and provide the College with a consent to OHIP attached as Schedule A . 
 
5.    I acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable, and undertake that I will not apply 
      either in Ontario or any other jurisdiction to perform any medical practice other than 
      surgical assisting. 
 
6.    I acknowledge that I have received independent legal advice prior to signing to the 
      undertaking. 
 
7.    I agree that this undertaking will be posted on the public register. 
 
8.    I acknowledge that if I fail to comply with the terms of this Undertaking, the College may 
      seek a referral to the Discipline Committee or a referral to the Fitness to Practice 
      Committee and may introduce this Undertaking into evidence at the hearing as proof of 
      its contents. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 19, 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 2003
Summary:

                                           -   

On September 29, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Riley committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he failed without reasonable cause to provide a report or 
certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by the member to the patient or his 
or her authorized representative within a reasonable time after the a patient or his or her 
authorized representative has requested such a report or certificate; that he failed to respond 
appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College.  These acts 
would be considered that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
      The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
            
  1)  That Dr. Riley attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
     to be recorded on the register; 
  2)  The Discipline Committee Orders the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
     Riley’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
  i   Dr.  Riley  will  have  a  practice  monitor  for  as  long  as  he  holds  a  license  to  practice 
     medicine. The practice monitor must be another member of the College, approved of by 
     the Registrar of the College or his designate, and must meet with Dr. Riley a minimum of 
     bi-weekly  to  review  all  incoming  relevant  medical  correspondence  with  Dr.  Riley  and 
     ensure  timely  follow-up  on  all  such  correspondence  including  request  for  records, 
     laboratory results, and correspondence from the College. The monitor must also review 
     Dr.  Riley’s  workload  and  give  his  consent  in  writing,  a  copy  of  which  is  to  be 
     immediately forwarded to the College, prior to Dr. Riley taking on any new patients. The 
     practice monitor and Dr. Riley must together provide a quarterly report to the Registrar of 
     the College or his designate as to the currency of Dr. Riley’s records, the timeliness of his 
     referrals and his follow-up on laboratory results and other correspondence. 
   ii       Dr. Riley will complete the College’s records keeping course at his own expense, by 
         the end of 2003, including all optional components of the course such as the follow-
         up review of his records and shall provide proof of having done so to the Registrar of 
         the College or his designate on or before December 31, 2003. 
   iii   Dr.  Riley  will  have  his  patient’s  file  with  him  for  each  patient  evaluation  or 
         examination  the  he  conducts  and  he  will  take  contemporary  notes  of  each  such 
         evaluation or examination. Dr. Riley will make specific note of any patient request 
         for referral in his records and will note any discussions regarding medical test results 
         discussed. 
   iv    Dr.  Riley  will  initial  and  date  all  laboratory,  ultra-sound  and  other  reports  upon 
         reviewing them. 
   v     Dr.  Riley  will  continue  psychotherapy  with  Dr.  O’Sullivan  or,  in  the  event  Dr. 
         O’Sullivan ceases to practice, with another psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar of 
         the College or his designate. Dr. O’Sullivan, or the approved psychiatrist treating Dr. 
         Riley,  will  provide  written  confirmation  of  regular,  bi-weekly,  attendance  to  the 
         Registrar  of  the  College  or  his  designate  every  six  months.  In  the  event  that  Dr. 
         O’Sullivan or the approved psychiatrist treating Dr. Riley determines that bi-weekly 
         attendance is unnecessary, the attendance schedule can be altered on notice and with 
         the approval of the Registrar of the College or his designate. 
                                        -   

vi    Dr. Riley will undergo an age related peer assessment within six (6) months of the 
      date  of  this  order  and  again  twelve  (12)  months  thereafter  at  the  expense  of  the 
      College. 
vii   Dr. Riley will keep a sign posted at all times, in the form attached hereto as Schedule 
      1, in all examination rooms used by him for the purpose of seeing patients. 
viii  Dr.  Riley  will  complete  a  perinatal  bereavement  course  offered  by  Perinatal 
      Bereavement Services of Ontario (“PBSO”) either on November 12 and 13, 2003 or 
      at the next offering of the course thereafter. If he is unable to attend the November, 
      2003  session,  Dr.  Riley  will  contact  the  PBSO  prior  to  November  12,  2003  and 
      inquire when the next course will be held and confirm that he is registered. If the next 
      course has not yet been scheduled at the time of Dr. Riley’s inquiry, Dr. Riley will 
      continue with monthly follow-ups with the PBSO and provide written notice of such 
      follow-ups to the Registrar of the College or his designate until such time as he has 
      registered for the perinatal bereavement course and will provide evidence of having 
      completed  the  course  to  the  Registrar  of  the  College  or  his  designate  within  two 
      weeks of having completed the course. 
ix       Dr. Riley will forthwith execute an irrevocable consent to be filed with the Registrar 
      of  the  College  that  if  allegations  of  a  breach  of  any  of  these  terms,  conditions  or 
      limitations is brought to the attention of the Registrar, then the Registrar shall suspend 
      Dr.  Riley’s  Certificate  of  Registration  on  seven  (7)  days  notice  to  him,  with  such 
      suspension to remain in effect until such allegations have been finally determined or 
      disposed of by the College through the complaints process and or discipline process 
x        Dr. Riley shall pay three thousand seven hundred and  fifty dollars ($3,750.00) for 
      these proceedings within twelve (12) months time. 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2003


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 1990
Summary:

 In February 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Riley guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within 
 a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his 
 authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  Consequently, the 
 Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Riley(s licence to practice was to be suspended 
 when this Order became final.

2.	Dr. Riley was to be fined the sum of $5000.00.

3.	Dr. Riley was 
 to complete the outstanding reports noted in this Hearing to the satisfaction of the 
 Registrar.

4.	The suspension of Dr. Riley(s licence to practice was to be terminated three months 
 following his compliance with items 2 and 3 above.

5.	A continuing condition was to be placed on 
 Dr. Riley(s licence to practice, such that he be obliged to provide the College on a quarterly 
 basis for two years with a notarized copy of a log showing date of receipt of all requests for 
 medical reports, their disposition and an explanation on action being taken on outstanding 
 reports.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Feb 1990


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 1989
Summary:

 In March 1989, Dr. Riley pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  The Discipline Committee accepted this 
 plea and found Dr. Riley guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered 
 that Dr. Riley be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that 
 he be fined $5000.00; and that if he failed to present himself for the reprimand and pay the fine 
 within thirty days of the Order becoming final, his licence to practice would be suspended until 
 those conditions were met.  The Committee also ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be 
 suspended for a period of ninety days, but that the suspension would itself be suspended if he 
 delivered the patient's medical report to his solicitor with a copy to the Registrar of the 
 College within thirty days of this Order becoming final.  All of these penalties were to be 
 recorded on the Register.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Mar 1989

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: September 22, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. George Terence Riley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, DR. GEORGE T. RILEY:
(1) Agree that commencing September 22, 2006 I am restricted from performing all medical practice except as a surgical assistant with a physician who is a member of the College who is present at all times at a hospital where that physician has privileges.
(2) Agree that at no time will I conduct any independent patient care.
(3) Agree that as a condition of my certificate of registration, and in order that compliance with conditions 1 and 2 can be monitored, I am required to obtain a letter signed by the Chief of Surgery at every hospital at which I have worked in the previous six months confirming that I have been working only as a surgical assistant. This Letter must be provided to the College on January 1 and June 30 of every year until I cease to practice.
(5) Acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable, and undertake that I will not apply either in Ontario or any other jurisdiction to perform any medical practice other than surgical assisting.
(7) Agree that this undertaking will be posted on the public register.