Riley, Jennifer Frances (CPSO#: 70245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Riley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Riley ( CPSO# 70245 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER FRANCES RILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RILEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001