Rindlisbacher, Timothy Jerome (CPSO#: 65334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3000
181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: (416) 507-6630
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Rindlisbacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rindlisbacher ( CPSO# 65334 )

Business Address:
Suite 3000
181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6757

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JEROME RINDLISBACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINDLISBACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993