Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ringash, Jolie Gay (CPSO#: 66724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2919
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOLIE GAY RINGASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGASH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1999