Ringnalda, Jacqueline (CPSO#: 51732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Health Centre
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Second Floor
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone: (416) 694-1400
Fax: (416) 694-1985
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Ringnalda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ringnalda ( CPSO# 51732 )

Business Address:
Victoria Health Centre
2nd Floor
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone Number: (416) 694-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE RINGNALDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGNALDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983