Rinn, Richard William (CPSO#: 31117)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre Department of Laboratories 596 Davis Drive Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018