Riopelle, Richard John (CPSO#: 22161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2472
Fax: (613) 548-2471
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN RIOPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOPELLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1977