Rios, Danielle Rae (CPSO#: 110781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  19 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Arizona, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE RAE RIOS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RIOS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RIOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RIOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RIOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RIOS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RIOS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 19 Nov 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017