Rir Omar, Jamila Jama Almi (CPSO#: 112531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMILA JAMA ALMI RIR OMAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RIR OMAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RIR OMAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RIR OMAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RIR OMAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RIR OMAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RIR OMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2017 to 04 Aug 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2017