Risdon, Catherine Louise (CPSO#: 65186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main Street West
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 546-9885
Fax: 905 972-8903
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LOUISE RISDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RISDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993