Rishikof, David Charles (CPSO#: 65269)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2000