Ristevski, Bill (CPSO#: 81070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44266
Fax: (905) 577-8271
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V1C3
Canada
Phone: 9055274322 Ext. 44266
Fax: 9055778271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave. East
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055274322 Ext. 44266
Fax: 9055778271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St. W
Hamilton ON  L8N3Z5
Canada
Phone: 9055274322 Ext. 44266
Fax: 9055778271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill Ristevski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ristevski ( CPSO# 81070 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - General Site
237 Barton Street East
Suite 5 North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BILL RISTEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RISTEVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009