Ristic, Miodrag (CPSO#: 22897)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:University of Belgrade, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013