Ritchie, James Whiteford Knox (CPSO#: 54904)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology 600 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Malaysia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Apr 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016