Ritchie, Laura Catherine (CPSO#: 87185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Operating Room (Cardiac Surgery)
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46277
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura C. Ritchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ritchie ( CPSO# 87185 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Operating Room-Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Operating Room-Cardiac Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA CATHERINE RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITCHIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2010