Ritsma, Jillian Rose (CPSO#: 102966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: 905-472-7086
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN ROSE RITSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITSMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2017