Rittenberg, Kevin Mark (CPSO#: 59648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone: (905) 660-9760
Fax: (905) 660-9762
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Rittenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rittenberg ( CPSO# 59648 )

Business Address:
3 - 7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 660-9760

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MARK RITTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITTENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989