Riva-Cambrin, Jay Kenneth (CPSO#: 72470)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006