Rivero Lopez, Luis Fernando (CPSO#: 96339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

155, rue Maclaren Est
Gatineau QC  J8L 0C2
Canada
Phone: (819) 986-3341
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Rivero Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivero Lopez ( CPSO# 96339 )
Dr. K. Pilon-Larose ( CPSO# 100184)

Business Address:
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS FERNANDO RIVERO LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVERO LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013