Rivers, Derek William (CPSO#: 71308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
340 Elgin Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 6G9
Phone: (905) 835-9817
Fax: (905) 835-1647
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM RIVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999