Rivet, Christine Cecil (CPSO#: 31864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CECIL RIVET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1980