Rivington, Elizabeth Grace (CPSO#: 58129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Lawrence Medical Clinic
Box 772
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: (613) 543-4171
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
Box 329
Ingleside ON  K0C 1M0
Phone: (613) 537-2044
Fax: (613) 537-2693
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Rivington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Dr. E. Rivington ( CPSO# 58129 )

Business Address:
St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
100 - 34 Ottawa Street
P.O. Box 772
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone Number: (613) 543-2963

Business Address:
2 Thorold Lane
Ingleside ON  K0C 1M0
Phone Number: (613) 537-2044

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 744-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ELIZABETH GRACE RIVINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1988