Rivlin, Alex Savelij Semeon (CPSO#: 32655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1981

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
312 Dolomite Dr
Toronto ON  M3J 2N2
Phone: (647) 773-1559
Fax: (416) 9818747
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

152 Foxwood Rd
Thornhill ON  L4J 0G3
Canada
Phone: (647) 773-1559
Fax: (416) 981-8747
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX SAVELIJ SEMEON RIVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Dec 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Dec 2012
Summary:

 On December 11, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rivlin committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise, and has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
 Dr. Rivlin admitted to the allegations. 

On or about December 21, 2010, Dr. Rivlin pleaded guilty 
 in the Ontario Court of Justice to one count of fraud over $5,000 and one count of possession of a 
 prohibited weapon with ammunition. Convictions were entered on the basis of Dr. Rivlin's 
 admissions to fraudulently billing OHIP in the amount of $168,794.21 between September of 2000 and 
 February of 2008, while he was out of the country. He also admitted to illegally possessing a 
 prohibited firearm and ammunition in a locked safe at his residence, which he had, at a patient's 
 request, agreed to store in his safe after the patient inadvertently left it in his office, until 
 the patient's return to Canada from the United States. It was seized by police during the 
 execution of the search warrant in March of 2008. 

In the criminal proceedings, Dr. Rivlin was 
 given a ninemonth conditional sentence with three months house arrest, followed by a twoyear term 
 of probation. He was also prohibited from billing OHIP for the duration of his conditional 
 sentence and probation. At the time of his guilty plea and sentencing, Dr. Rivlin made restitution 
 to OHIP. 

The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand, a 12month suspension of Dr. 
 Rivlin's certificate of registration and costs of $3,650.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 11, 2012