Rizk, Magdy Girgis Azmy (CPSO#: 90232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.R. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rizk ( CPSO# 90232 )
Dr. S. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 90198 )

Business Address:
1887 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Magdy Girgis Azmy Rizk may practise medicine as a surgical assistant
                  in the operating room.

            2.    Dr. Rizk  will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and
                  he shall not provide any pre- or post-operative care.