Rizk, Nada Nabil Anis (CPSO#: 88725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Park Medical Clinic
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 5W6
Phone: (905) 257-1006
Fax: (905) 257-0661
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1750 the queensway
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5H5
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 626-5840
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rizk ( CPSO# 88725 )
Dr. S. Youssef ( CPSO# 111512)

Business Address:
Oak Park Medical Clinic
Oakville
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 6W5
Phone Number: (905) 257-1006

Business Address:
1750 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M9C 5H5
Phone Number: (416) 626-6363

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADA NABIL ANIS RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010