Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rizkalla, Kamilia Sami (CPSO#: 51736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMILIA SAMI RIZKALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZKALLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989