Ro, Athanasius Sang-Ki (CPSO#: 58464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2A
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone: (905) 434-1694
Fax: (905) 434-6308
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ro ( CPSO# 58464 )

Business Address:
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 434-2767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATHANASIUS SANG-KI RO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1988