Robb, Paul Anderson (CPSO#: 70401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Robb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robb ( CPSO# 70401 )

Business Address:
Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone Number: (416) 595-1521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANDERSON ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012