Roberge, Elise (CPSO#: 82082)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hopital Montfort 713 Chemin Montreal Ottawa, ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2004 to 16 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2014