Robern, Michael R. (CPSO#: 57459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 224-6339
Fax: (613) 224-2651
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL R. ROBERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008