Robert, Christopher Eugene (CPSO#: 91879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 684-4364
Fax: (905) 684-4466
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Robert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Robert ( CPSO# 91879 )

Business Address:
204 - 589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EUGENE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012