Robert, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 102086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Robert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robert ( CPSO# 102086)

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015