Robert, Johanne (CPSO#: 69067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: Grondin, Johanne (used until: 17 Jun 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 Mill Street
PO BOX 899
Vankleek Hill ON  K0B 1R0
Phone: (613) 678-5551
Fax: (613) 678-5550
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johanne Robert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robert ( CPSO# 69067 )

Business Address:
42 Mill Street
P.O. Box 899
Vankleek Hill ON  K0B 1R0
Phone Number: (613) 678-5551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1997