Robert, Paul Francis (CPSO#: 29002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 684-4364
Fax: (905) 684-4466
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Robert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robert ( CPSO# 29002 )

Business Address:
204 - 589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL FRANCIS ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977