Roberts, Alfred Edwin (CPSO#: 54739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
c/o Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52201
Fax: (519) 971-7924
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1825 Manning Rd., Ste. 700
RR#1 Tecumseh
Tecumseh ON  N8N 2L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 979-7227
Fax: (519) 979-1956
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel Dieu Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. E. Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Roberts ( CPSO# 54739 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
700 - 1825 Manning Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 979-7227

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oklahoma

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED EDWIN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984