Roberts, Eve Ann (CPSO#: 33688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6171
Fax: (416) 813-4972
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVE ANN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1982