Roberts, George Raymond Tregson (CPSO#: 29106)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 4, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. George Raymond Tregson Roberts to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 04, 2015:

Dr. Roberts has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.