Roberts, Gordon Gregory (CPSO#: 90744)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014