Roberts, Jeremy Keith Alken (CPSO#: 42435)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 03 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sheffield, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Nov 2010

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: On February 23, 2016, the Registrar referred Jeremy Keith Robert's application for reinstatement to the Discipline Committee.

Hearing Date(s): Motion: Feb 21/17, Hearing: Apr 3, Jun 19/17

Hearing Status: Decision Under Reserve

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Nov 2010
Summary:

 On November 3, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roberts has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under clause 51(1)(b) of the Code, in that the governing body of a health 
 profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Roberts committed an act of 
 professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario 
 Regulation 856/93.

On or about March 13, 2008, Dr. Robert was found guilty by the Council of the 
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Alberta of unbecoming conduct and/or demonstrating a lack of 
 skill or judgment in that he:

(a)	Had an inappropriate relationship, which included sexual 
 activity, with his patient.
(b)	Inappropriately used prescription medication without the 
 prescription of another physician.
(c)	Failed to create and maintain a clinical record for Patient 
 "A" on five dates.
(d)	Failed to make arrangements from the transfer of care of Patient "A" to 
 another psychiatrist.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar 
 revoke Dr. Roberts' certificate of registration immediately.
2.	Dr. Roberts appear before the 
 panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Roberts pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650, within 
 sixty (60) days.
4.	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 3, 2010