Roberts, John Adrian (CPSO#: 65733)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Hospital
801 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6C 5J1
Phone: (519) 685-4292
Electoral District: 02

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 1997