Roberts, Lesley Ann (CPSO#: 61646)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991