Roberts, Mark Steven (CPSO#: 87812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth & Smith's Falls District Hosp
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-3232
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2007 to 11 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2008 to 18 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010