Roberts, Robert James (CPSO#: 30461)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 79 Bedford Street, Westport, ON X0G 1X0
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 16, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Roberts to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2015.

Dr. Roberts was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Roberts resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)