Roberts, Robert (CPSO#: 21784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 East Van Buren Street
Phoenix AZ  85004
United States
Phone: (602) 540-9878

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 South Central Avenue, Phoenix, AZ 85004
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016