Roberts, Stanley Dwayne (CPSO#: 58665)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1995