Robertshaw, Laura Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100437)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2016