Robertson, Andrew Scott Alexander (CPSO#: 103649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Family Health Team
145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: 613-771-0689
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT ALEXANDER ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016